+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0931)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 931 (effective 7/1/07)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1384ER2)
- Reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1384ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 072176824-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1384E
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 072176824
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor