+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1379ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1379S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104789D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1050
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104789D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 11101318D
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2011: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor