+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Courts of Justice by voice vote
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1377E
- Printed as engrossed 13104807D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 13104807D
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor