+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 071665738
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor