+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/13)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1376ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Passed House with amendments (96-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended SB1376
- Amendments by Delegate Albo agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 13104715D
- Introduced at the request of Governor