+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1373ER)
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent to introduce
- Presented and ordered printed 13104488D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor