+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 15105745D-S3
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1371ER)
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 15105631D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Gilbert, Yost, Ward
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Ruff, Reeves, Petersen
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 35-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1371H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105329D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105329D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1371S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104925D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Incorporates SB863
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 15104925D-S1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 15103699D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 35-N)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor