+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1369ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104590D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1369S1
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 11104590D-S1
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103744D