+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 318 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1365ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090304808
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2009: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
February 2, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor