+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 275 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1363ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Read first time
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1363S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23105244D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23105244D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100114D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2023: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2023: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor