+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
- Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N)
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1362ER)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
- Passed House with amendments (67-Y 32-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to
- Read third time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1362S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104447D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1297 (Vogel)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17104447D-S1
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101855D