+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1356ER)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Assigned Finance sub: #2
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 13101560D
- Referred to Committee on Finance