+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 583 (effective 7/1/15)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1354ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 15105599D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Ramadan, Greason, Mason
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reeves, Cosgrove, Dance
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105037D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1354H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105037D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1354S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104857D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1347
- Committee substitute printed 15104857D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 15103164D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
February 26, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 24, 2015: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor