+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Left in Education and Health
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed to Web only 16105492D-S2
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Committee substitute printed 16105063D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101808D
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2016: Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor