+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104751D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1347ES1
- Printed as engrossed 11104751D-ES1
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Incorporates SB1438
- Committee substitute printed 11104751D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101507D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 3, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
January 26, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor