+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 854 (effective 7/1/09)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1347ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1347ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 090241340-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 4-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 4-N)
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 090241340-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (76-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1347H1
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 090241340-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1347S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 090181340-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 090181340-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned C&L sub: Utilities
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090115804
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
April 8, 2009: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
February 25, 2009: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 4-N)
February 25, 2009: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 4-N)
February 25, 2009: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
February 19, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor