+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
On March 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1347ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 019234524-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 019234524
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from Militia and Police (23-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2001: Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor