+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
On March 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1344ER)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 051763752-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1344H1
- Passed House with substitute (95-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 051763752-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1344E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Communicated to House
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 051543752-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 051543752
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor