+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 298 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1343ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (88-Y 7-N 1-A)
- Passed House (88-Y 7-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101724D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2021: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 7-N 1-A)
February 18, 2021: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor