+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 231 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1343ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute 035244536-S1
- Substitute by Sen. Stolle agreed to 035244536-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 035244536-S1 (Stolle)
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 034615536
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor