+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
On March 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 519 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1342ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time
- Amendment by Del. Bell agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (90-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 10-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1342E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Stolle agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 057322752-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 2-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 057322752
- Unanimous consent to introduce