+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11101436D-E
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1341E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 2-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101436D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 4, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor