+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
On March 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1340ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 014186472-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 014186472-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 014186472-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 015447472