+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 21103918D-S1
- Committee substitute rejected 21104284D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 21104416D-S3 (Surovell)
- Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104416D-S3
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1339S3
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21104284D-S2
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Judiciary sub: Expungement
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100793D