+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1338ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/09)
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1338ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senators: Herring, Vogel, McEachin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Delegates: O'Bannon, Nixon, Sickles
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (10-Y 28-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments Set 1 by Senator Cuccinelli rejected
- Amendments Set 2 by Senator Cuccinelli rejected
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1338E
- Printed as engrossed 095979736-E
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 095979736