+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Transportation
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 079427766-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1337S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 079427766-S1
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 079377766
+ − Votes (4)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor