+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 112 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1336ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
- Passed House (80-Y 18-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 030672522-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 030672522-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 030672522-S1
On February 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (13-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 039835522
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
February 17, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor