+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (68)
On April 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0901)
On March 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 901 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1332ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Conference substitute printed 057812324-S3
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 38-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- Delegates: Hogan, Jones, S. C., Abbitt
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (36-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Puckett, Hawkins, Hanger
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 053141792-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1332H1
- Passed House with substitute (91-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053141792-H1
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (22-Y 2-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Health & Human Resources
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Amendments #1-5 by Sen. Wampler withdrawn
- Reading of amendments waived
- Substitute by Sen. Puckett agreed to 055088792-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Amendments #1-5 by Sen. Puckett withdrawn
- Committee substitute rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Amds #1,2,3,4,5 by Sen. Wampler rejected (7-Y 31-N)
- Amendment #6 by Sen. Wampler withdrawn
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3,4,5 (7-Y 31-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Puckett agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub w/amds. SB1332ES2
- Printed as engrossed 055088792-ES2
- Rules suspended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 055088792-S2 (Puckett)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 052280792-S1
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 059890792
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (0-Y 38-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (36-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 14, 2005: Reported from Appropriations with sub (22-Y 2-N)
February 3, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2005: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3,4,5 (7-Y 31-N)
January 28, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2005: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor