+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (30-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (3-Y 37-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: (30-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Cuccinelli, Quayle, Saslaw
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Putney, Hogan, Valentine
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N)
- Passed House with substitute (94-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1331H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 073501260-H1
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 073501260-H1
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Communicated to House
- Committee substitute rejected 073463720-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 073493720-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1331S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 073493720-S2
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 073463720-S1
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 078316720
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (3-Y 37-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (30-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor