+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1331ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Title replaced 19106668D-H1
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1331H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106668D-H1
- Read third time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 19106668D-H1
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105740D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1331S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 19105740D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102737D