+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1330ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to General Laws
- Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer.by C.& L. (11-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 032860540
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Referred from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer.by C.& L. (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor