+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (13-Y 9-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Substitute by Sen. Quayle agreed to 052781800-S2
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 052776800-S1
- Floor substitute printed 052781800-S2 (Quayle)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1330S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 052776800-S1
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 059166800
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2005: Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (13-Y 9-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from General Laws with sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor