+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
On March 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1324ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 013783210-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 013783210
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor