+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1321ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (37-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 017096436-E
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 017096436
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2001: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (37-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2001: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor