+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 181 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1321ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102471D
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor