+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (23-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 039085414-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 039085414-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 039085414-S1
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 036035414
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2003: Tabled in Appropriations (23-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor