+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 092751520-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1319E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092751520
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 9, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor