+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 56 (effective 2/19/19)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19102366D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor