+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 795 (effective 7/1/13)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1317ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1317ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (89-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 9-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1317E
- Printed as engrossed 13103790D-E
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 13103790D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 4-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor