+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1317ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 070209158
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 1-N)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor