+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 71 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1313ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute rejected 21103505D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104193D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1313S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21104193D-S2
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 21103505D-S1
- Incorporates SB1114 (Peake)
- Incorporates SB1099 (Stuart)
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102548D