+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
On March 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1312ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1312S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 053758780-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 053758780-S1
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 056322780
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor