+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 31, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
On March 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1312ER)
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 993648724
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1999: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor