+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Tabled in Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub.w/amds. 031846520-ES1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 031846520-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Quayle agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 031846520-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 031846520-S1
On February 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 036105520
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2003: Tabled in Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor