+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice w/sub. (16-Y 6-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 963460633-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 2-N)
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 963460633
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1996: Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice w/sub. (16-Y 6-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor