+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 233 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB131ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Subcommittee #1 (FOIA)
On January 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081755244
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor