+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB131ER)
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 020644536
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
February 22, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
January 21, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor