+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1309S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103219D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103219D-S1
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102847D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 21, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2021: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor