+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (60)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1309ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 755 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1309ER)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 15105412D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments (94-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read third time
- Passed House (90-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 2-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed by temporarily
- Amendments by Delegate Jones agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (94-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House insisted on amendments (100-Y 0-N)
- House requested conference committee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Ruff, Reeves, Barker
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Anderson, Knight, Spruill
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1309S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104593D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104593D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103328D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (15)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (94-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 2-N)
February 17, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor