+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/13)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1305ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 5-N)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1305ER)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (95-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Assigned Transportation sub: #4
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104822D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Wagner agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1305ES1
- Printed as engrossed 13104822D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13104822D-S1
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Trans sub: #1
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Transportation
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 13103996D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology